+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 545 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB289ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 20102650D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB289E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102650D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2020: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
R. Creigh Deeds
Type:
Primary Sponsor