+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0377)
On April 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 377 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB288ER)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 003486460-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 003486460-H1
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 003486460-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (25-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Engrossed bill reprinted 004536680-E
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Printed as engrossed 004536680-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 004536680
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2000: Reported from Tra. w/sub (25-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: Reported from Transportation w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor