+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 567 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB286ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 12105556D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB286H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105556D-H1
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12105556D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101735D
+ − Votes (9)
March 1, 2012: House substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N)
February 28, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
January 23, 2012: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
January 23, 2012: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
January 19, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor