+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352)
On April 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 352 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB284ER)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 987201635
- Referred to Committee on Finance