+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0460)
On March 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 460 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB284ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
- Passed House (93-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 085922344-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB284E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 085922344
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 27, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
February 22, 2008: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N)
February 8, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2008: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor