+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0283)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 283 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB282ER)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 983149815
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor