+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: DEFEATED (19-Y 20-N)
- Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 021850460