+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525)
On April 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 525 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB279ER)
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (21-Y 1-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 961715726
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
February 22, 1996: Reported from Tra. (21-Y 1-N)
January 30, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1996: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor