+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1033)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1033 (effective - see bill)
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB277ER)
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (27-Y 13-N)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (55-Y 44-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 44-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Delegates: Watts, Keam, Campbell, J.L.
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: Barker, Marsden, Ebbin
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
- Committee on Appropriations amendments agreed to
- Committee on Finance amendment agreed to
- Passed House with amendments (52-Y 46-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House insisted on amendments
- House requested conference committee
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill not properly before the Senate (24-Y 16-N)
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 9-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 9-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 4-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 20103304D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB277E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name
On January 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103304D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (12)
March 7, 2020: Conference report agreed to by Senate (27-Y 13-N)
March 5, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 44-N)
February 26, 2020: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
February 26, 2020: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N)
February 26, 2020: Bill not properly before the Senate (24-Y 16-N)
February 21, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 9-N)
February 19, 2020: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 9-N)
February 17, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 4-N)
February 5, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
February 3, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
George L. Barker
Type:
Primary Sponsor