+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee amendment rejected
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104709D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB277S1
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104709D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
On January 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102208D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2014: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor