+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Continued to 2005 in S.T. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 040984726-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB275S1
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 040984726-S1
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 041145726
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2004: Continued to 2005 in S.T. (14-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor