+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585)
On April 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 585 (effective 4/15/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB273ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- House amendments accepted by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Amended by conference committee
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 3-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause added by conference committee
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT R (3-Y 37-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House insisted on amendment
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM.R (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Armstrong, Day, Ingram
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Reynolds, Schrock, Forbes
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Amendment by Mr. Bryant agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed House with amendment (95-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 4
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 988912728-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed 988912728
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 3-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (40-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT R (3-Y 37-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM.R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
March 4, 1998: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N)
February 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1998: Reported from Local Government w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor