+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0108)
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 108 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB273ER)
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 048167726
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2004: Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2004: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor