+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 360 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB271ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Taken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB271S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105240D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18105240D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101791D
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor