+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB27E
- Printed as engrossed 18100247D-E
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On November 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100247D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health