+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 191 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB268ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (31-Y 6-N)
- Title replaced 20108161D-H1
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N)
- Passed House with substitute (99-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB268H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108161D-H1
- Read third time
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Committee substitute printed 20108161D-H1
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 20102386D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB268E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name
On January 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102386D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2020: House substitute agreed to by Senate (31-Y 6-N)
February 17, 2020: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N)
February 12, 2020: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
John J. Bell
Type:
Primary Sponsor