+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Continued to 2005 in P. & E. (11-Y 10-N)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 048812788-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB268S1
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 048812788-S1
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 3
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 044783788
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2004: Continued to 2005 in P. & E. (11-Y 10-N)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2004: Reported from P. & E. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor