+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821)
On April 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 821 (effective 4/8/96)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB267ER)
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB267ER)
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Emergency clause added
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (99-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amd. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 966814819
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 1996: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1996: Reported from Tra. w/amd. (21-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1996: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor