+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 982715728