+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (16-Y 6-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106951D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB266S1
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101585D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health