+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 723 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723)
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB265ER)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Stolle, Knight, Hayes
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Stuart, Lewis, Chafin
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- House insisted on amendment
- House requested conference committee
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106801D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB265S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106801D-S1
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to pass by indefinitely failed (7-Y 7-N 1-A)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 3-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101723D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
+ − Votes (13)
March 9, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N)
March 8, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2018: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: House amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
February 27, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 3-N)
January 30, 2018: Motion to pass by indefinitely failed (7-Y 7-N 1-A)
January 18, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 3-N)
January 15, 2018: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor