+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0900)
- Reenrolled bill text (SB261ER2)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 900 (effective 7/1/06)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 3-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB261ER)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (33-Y 7-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N)
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB261S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 064457832-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 064457832-S1
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062630832
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (33-Y 7-N)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2006: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor