+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 190 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB261ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 1-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB261S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20105830D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20105830D-S1
- Incorporates SB308 (Stanley)
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
On January 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104495D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2020: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2020: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
A. Benton "Ben" Chafin
Type:
Primary Sponsor