+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0913)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 24-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (72-Y 24-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB26ER)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 913 (effective 7/1/96)
On April 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB26ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO - PART II (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendment #6 agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO - PART I (38-Y 0-N)
- House amdts #1 thru 5 agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Amendment by Mr. Cranwell agreed to
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 967860739-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 967860739-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 967860739-S1
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Justice
On January 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 966955739
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 24-N)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: AGREE TO - PART I (38-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: AGREE TO - PART II (38-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1996: Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor