+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and defeated by Senate (15-Y 25-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 12100889D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB26E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (9-Y 6-N)
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On December 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100889D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2012: Read third time and defeated by Senate (15-Y 25-N)
February 10, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (9-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor