+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 678 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB259ER)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB259S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 048260736-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 048260736-S1
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 042311736
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2004: Reported from Transportation w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor