+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- No action taken by Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed LD0544661 (SB258E)
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor