+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0725)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 725 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB257ER)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (37-Y 1-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Amendment by Delegate Hogan rejected
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (85-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N)
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (15-Y 6-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB257ES1
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 1-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Wagner agreed to
- VOTE: (35-Y 3-N)
- Printed as engrossed 069709832-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 069709832-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Cuccinelli rejected
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB257S1
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 069709832-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062804832