+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 75 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0075)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB256ER)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101743D
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2018: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor