+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (30-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 7-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
On January 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 982935722
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (30-Y 7-N)
February 2, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor