+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
On April 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 853 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB255ER)
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 004722500-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendments by Sen. Mims agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed 004722500
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2000: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
January 28, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2000: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor