+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509)
On April 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 509 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB253ER)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Copeland agreed to
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (36-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed