+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 5-N)
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102079D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology