+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
On March 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 368 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB252ER)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 063466136