+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
On March 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 170 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB251ER)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 062409136-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB251E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062409136