+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 104 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB25ER)
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On January 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/12/03 040732160
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2004: Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor