+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 809 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB249ER)
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 30-N)
- Passed House with substitute (64-Y 30-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 022206526-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 022206526-H1
- Read third time
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (16-Y 6-N)
- Committee substitute printed 022206526-H1
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 023936526-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 023936526-S1
On January 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 023936526-S1
On January 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 020108526
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2002: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 30-N)
February 27, 2002: Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (16-Y 6-N)
January 22, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor