+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Continued to 2011 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: #1 Agriculture
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103432D
+ − Votes (3)
January 21, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2010: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor