+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Continued to 2007 in General Laws by voice vote
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing (Suit)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065328828
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2006: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor