+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 544 (effective 7/1/20)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB246ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Passed House (57-Y 43-N)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 9-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 20105924D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB246S1
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N 1-A)
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20105924D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
On January 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101569D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 2020: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N)
February 20, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 9-N)
February 17, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
January 29, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N 1-A)
January 16, 2020: Reported from Transportation with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Scott A. Surovell
Type:
Primary Sponsor