+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0852)
On April 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 852 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB243ER)
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendments rejected by conference committee
- Amended by conference committee
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- Delegates: Sherwood, McEachin, O'Brien
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senators: Bolling, Martin, Maxwell
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendments
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (2-Y 37-N)
- House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (23-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 006856404-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 006856404
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (38-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (2-Y 37-N)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2000: Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (23-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2000: Reported from P. & E. with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor