+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0231)
On April 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 231 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB243ER)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (94-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. B. sub-committee: 2
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 980773845
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1998: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor