+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 76 (effective 7/1/02)
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB240ER)
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On January 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 025426254
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2002: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2002: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor