+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 564 (effective 1/1/13 - see bill)
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB240ER)
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB240ER)
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (77-Y 22-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N)
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 2-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 12103236D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB240E
- Amendment by Senator Saslaw rejected (17-Y 23-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103236D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
March 6, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N)
March 2, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 2-N)
February 27, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
February 14, 2012: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2012: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N)
February 14, 2012: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N)
February 13, 2012: Amendment by Senator Saslaw rejected (17-Y 23-N)
February 2, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor