+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
On April 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 335 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB239ER)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (25-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 5
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 005389208
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: Reported from General Laws (25-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2000: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor