+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
On April 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 684 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB237ER)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time
- Read second time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Communicated to House
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7181605 (SB237S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor