+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 719 (effective 7/1/16)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/28/16
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB237ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Amended by conference committee
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Delegates: Peace, Hodges, Bulova
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stuart, Petersen, Black
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (99-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 2-N)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB237S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104518D-S1
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 16104518D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102890D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
March 11, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
March 11, 2016: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
March 10, 2016: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2016: House amendment rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
March 4, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2016: Reported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 2-N)
March 1, 2016: Reported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 2-N)
February 23, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
February 9, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2016: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor