+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0350)
On April 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 350 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB237ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 983039717-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented & ordered printed 983039717
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1998: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor