+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 145 (effective 3/11/10)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145)
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB236ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 10105592D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105592D-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB236H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10105592D-H1
- Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Emergency clause added
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB236S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105040D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 10105040D-S1
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: Special on Technology
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103312D