+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Continued to 2005 in Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (26-Y 13-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N)
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (11-Y 4-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 047570780
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2004: Continued to 2005 in Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (26-Y 13-N)
February 9, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2004: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor